Governing document THE BRITISH SOCIETY OF AESTHETICS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JANUARY 1966 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 6 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 SEP 2016 INCORPORATED 25 JAN 1966 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE STUDY, RESEARCH AND DISCUSSION IN AESTHETICS. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS ARTICLE, THE TERM “AESTHETICS” REFERS TO ALL STUDIES OF THE ARTS, AESTHETIC EXPERIENCE, AND THE PRINCIPLES OF CRITICISM, WHETHER FROM A PHILOSOPHICAL, SCIENTIFIC, OR OTHER THEORETICAL STANDPOINT, INCLUDING THOSE OF PSYCHOLOGY, SOCIOLOGY, ANTHROPOLOGY, CULTURAL HISTORY AND EDUCATION. ALSO FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS ARTICLE, THE TERM “ART” REFERS TO ALL BRANCHES OF ART.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.