FAMOUS TRAINS MODEL RAILWAY

Charity number: 1126173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 02 February 2021 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 02 February 2021 728 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 07 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required