FAMOUS TRAINS MODEL RAILWAY

Charity number: 1126173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £6.38k £4.99k £5.70k £6.09k £6.09k
Total expenditure £3.62k £2.54k £1.25k £4.07k £4.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A