Accounts and annual returns ST JOHN'S FOUNDATION PORTHCAWL

Charity number: 1126671
Charity reporting is overdue by 151 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 151 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 151 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 March 2021 270 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required