THE PRINCIPAL AND FELLOWS OF SOMERVILLE COLLEGE

Charity number: 1139440
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

43 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Faridah Zaman Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
ANDREW PARKER Trustee 02 January 2013
MOUNTVIEW ACADEMY OF THEATRE ARTS LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
MOUNTVIEW ARTS CENTRE LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
THE MARGARET THATCHER SCHOLARSHIP TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
PROFESSOR STEPHEN WEATHERILL Trustee None on record
Professor Almut Suerbaum Trustee
THE MARGARET THATCHER SCHOLARSHIP TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Professor Louise Mycock Trustee 01 August 2017 None on record
Dr JONATHAN BURTON Trustee None on record
Professor Christopher Hare Trustee 01 October 2012 None on record
Professor Damian Tyler Trustee 01 October 2015 None on record
Dr LUKE PITCHER BA MA MST Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR LOIS MCNAY Trustee None on record
Baroness Janet Royall Trustee 01 October 2017
CHARLES AND JULIA HENRY FUND Charity reporting is up to date
FULL FACT Charity reporting is up to date
PROFESSOR FIONA STAFFORD SPARKES FRSE Trustee None on record
ANNIE SUTHERLAND Trustee None on record
Professor Guido Ascari Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
Julian Duxfield Trustee 02 September 2013 None on record
Charlotte Potts Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record
Dr Francesca Southerden Trustee 01 August 2016 None on record
PROFESSOR RICHARD STONE Trustee None on record
Dr PHILIP WEST Trustee None on record
Dr DANIEL ANTHONY Trustee None on record
Dr JULIE DICKSON Trustee None on record
Dr ANNE MANUEL Trustee 13 January 2012 None on record
Dr Steve Rayner Trustee 04 July 2011
UNIVERSIFY EDUCATION Charity reporting is up to date
Professor Renier Van der Hoorn Trustee 01 October 2013 None on record
Dr Samantha Dieckmann Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
Professor Renaud Lambiotte Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
PROFESSOR CHARLES SPENCE PHD Trustee None on record
Dr MATTHEW WOOD BM BCH MA Trustee None on record
Dr MICHAEL HAYWARD Trustee None on record
Dr BENJAMIN THOMPSON MA PHD Trustee None on record
Dr BEATE DIGNAS Trustee None on record
Professor Dan Ciubotaru Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
Dr SIMON KEMP Trustee None on record
Professor Mari Mikkola Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
Professor Elena Seiradake Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
PROFESSOR ADITI LAHIRI Trustee
UK ALEXANDER VON HUMBOLDT ASSOCIATION Charity reporting is up to date
THE BRITISH ACADEMY FOR THE PROMOTION OF HISTORICAL PHILOSOPHICAL AND PHILOLOGICAL STUDIES Charity reporting is up to date
THE PHILOLOGICAL SOCIETY Charity reporting is up to date
Dr ROMAN WALCZAK Trustee None on record
Professor Karen Nielsen Trustee 02 July 2013 None on record
Dr Vivien Parmentier Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
PROFESSOR STEPHEN ROBERTS Trustee None on record
Dr NATALIA MAGDALENA NOWAKOWSKA Trustee None on record
Prof Rajesh Thakker Trustee
SOCIETY FOR ENDOCRINOLOGY Charity reporting is up to date
Sara Kalim Trustee 01 October 2014 None on record