Accounts and annual returns WATER-SPORTS 4 CANCER RESEARCH [W4CR]

Charity number: 1128492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 24 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 28 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 21 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 17 January 2020 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 13 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required