TAVISTOCK AREA SUPPORT SERVICES

Charity number: 1129175
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 05 September 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)