TAVISTOCK AREA SUPPORT SERVICES

Charity number: 1129175
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £14.98k £15.40k £0 N/A £14.73k
Income from government grants £116.43k £37.63k £21.90k £20.16k £1.30k
Other income £119.28k £111.76k £128.27k £237.66k £159.09k
Total expenditure £176.92k £182.34k £211.43k £232.67k £212.30k