TAVISTOCK AREA SUPPORT SERVICES

Charity number: 1129175
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Hibbert Trustee 28 January 2021 None on record
Gail Reed Trustee 21 March 2018 None on record
Annette Bessant Trustee 18 March 2020 None on record
Jan Gasper Chair 31 July 2018 None on record
Deborah Ann Holland Trustee 17 July 2019 None on record
VALERIE DODDS Trustee 24 December 2008 None on record