Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THE ROBERT WILLIS AND VIOLET WILLIS TRUST HOME (BETHSHAN AND ELSHADDAI)
Charity number: 1072645-1
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27/11/1982
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 31/01/2000
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27/10/2005
AS AMENDED ON 17/02/2009
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 05/03/2015
Charitable objects
THE NET PROCEEDS OF SALE MUST BE USED FOR THE PURPOSES OF REST, CONVALESCENCE, RECOVERY AND RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF AGE, YOUTH, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 25 February 2009: Standard registration
- 21 January 2016: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 21 January 2016: Funds transferred to 1072645 NEW COMMUNITY NETWORK
Other names
- BETHSHAN ELSHADDAI (Working name)
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.