Accounts and annual returns AL QURAN ACADEMY LONDON

Charity number: 1135391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 29 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 29 April 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 17 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 17 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 24 June 2020 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 24 June 2020 55 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 01 May 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 01 May 2019 1 days late Download Open in new window