BANGLADESHI YOUTH ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1129714
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 February 2021 11 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 March 2020 32 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 17 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 October 2016 On time Download