Dogfen lywodraethu Holt Youth Project
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 MAY 2015 AS AMENDED ON 12 JUN 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 JAN 2020 as amended on 02 Jan 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE SOCIAL WELFARE AND EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND YOUNG ADULTS IN HOLT AND ENVIRONS AND TO PROVIDE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE AND OPERATION OF FACILITIES WITHIN A PURPOSE BUILT ENVIRONMENT.
Maes buddion
HOLT AND ENVIRONS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.