Accounts and annual returns THE WARDEN AND SCHOLARS OF THE HOUSE OR COLLEGE OF SCHOLARS OF MERTON IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1139022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 16 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 16 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 08 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 02 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 02 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 22 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 22 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 14 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 14 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window