Trustees THE WARDEN AND SCHOLARS OF THE HOUSE OR COLLEGE OF SCHOLARS OF MERTON IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1139022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

67 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor John Geddes Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
Dr Hadleigh Frost Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Dr Brianne Dolce Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Vatsal Khandelwal Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Dr Chloe Deambrogio Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Helen Craske Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Dr James Newton Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Mark Coote Trustee 04 May 2021
None on record
Xiangyu Jie Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
Nicholas Irwin Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
Emily Rutherford Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
Dr Nathaniel Lane Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
Alice Burnyeat Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
Dr Henry Spelman Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
Dr Jane Gover Trustee 04 May 2020
None on record
Professor Thomas Richards Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Dr Jennifer Altenhenger Trustee 09 October 2019
None on record
Frances Dunn Trustee 09 October 2019
None on record
Professor Irene Tracey Trustee 05 October 2019
None on record
Dr Daniel Sawyer Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Elias Nosrati Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Professor Helen Small Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Dr Alice Brooke Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Dr Madhavi Krishnan Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
Dr Joshua Firth Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
Professor Lorna Hutson Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record
Professor Matthew Higgins Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record
Professor Julian Knight Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record
Professor Ehud Hrushovski Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record
Tim Lightfoot Trustee 09 May 2016
None on record
PROFESSOR HUGH WATKINS Trustee 01 May 2016
CARDIOVASCULAR FORUM
Received: On time
FRA' JOHN EIDINOW Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record
Prof Radek Erban Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
ANDREW MACKIE Trustee 05 December 2013
None on record
DR SIMON WOLFE SAUNDERS PHD Trustee 01 October 2013
THE ARCHIVE TRUST FOR RESEARCH IN MATHEMATICAL SCIENCES AND PHILOSOPHY
Received: On time
Dr Bassel Tarbush Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
CHARLES ALAN HEATHCOTE ALEXANDER Trustee 14 February 2013
DRAGON SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
OXFORD LIEDER
Received: On time
PROFESSOR SIR ANDREW WILES Trustee 14 November 2011
None on record
Dr Kate Blackmon Trustee 01 October 2003
None on record
MINDY CHEN-WISHART Trustee
None on record
Dr ALAN BARR Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR CHIH-HAO LUKE ONG Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR PETER NEARY FBA Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR BELA NOVAK Trustee
None on record
Dr MICHAEL WHITWORTH Trustee
None on record
REV DR SIMON JONES Trustee
None on record
Dr RHIANNON ASH Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR VERONIQUE GOUVERNEUR PHD FRSC Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR ARTUR EKERT Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR IRENE LEMOS Trustee
None on record
JOHN GLOAG Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR ALAN MORRISON Trustee
None on record
JENNIFER PAYNE Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR ALEXANDER SCOTT Trustee
None on record
PROF DANIEL MACGREGOR GRIMLEY Trustee
None on record
Dr ALEXANDER SCHEKOCHIHIN Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR SIMON MARTIN HOOKER Trustee
None on record
PROF DAVID PATERSON Trustee
None on record
Professor JONATHAN RALPH WARBURG PRAG Trustee
THOMAS WIEDEMANN MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
PROFESSOR TIM GUILFORD D.PHIL Trustee
None on record
Dr Matthew Grimley Trustee
THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND RECORD SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE HOLLAND LECTURESHIP
Received: On time
Dr STEVEN GUNN Trustee
None on record
Dr IAN MACLACHLAN Trustee
None on record
Dr PATRICIA THORNTON Trustee
None on record
Dr JULIA CAROLINE WALWORTH Trustee
SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF MEDIEVAL LANGUAGES AND LITERATURE
Received: On time
PROF RICHARD MCCABE FBA Trustee
THE CAMBRIDGE PROJECT FOR THE BOOK TRUST
Received: On time
PROFESSOR PETER WILLIAM HAROLD HOLLAND Trustee
RAY LANKESTER FUND
Received: On time
WILDLIFE RESEARCH AND MANAGEMENT TRUST FUND
Received: On time