Trustees THE ARTS SOCIETY SOUTH CAMBS

Charity number: 1132219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Fraser Ross Chair 19 March 2015
None on record
Jennifer Lyn Wells Trustee 29 May 2022
None on record
Glynis Ceridwen Messenger Trustee 17 March 2022
None on record
Christopher Martin Wagner Trustee 17 March 2022
None on record
Eng Moy Winter Trustee 17 March 2022
None on record
Daphne Elisabeth Lott Trustee 18 March 2021
None on record
GILLIAN MARY DAVIDSON Trustee 19 June 2020
None on record
DIANA JOAN SAGE Trustee 19 June 2020
None on record
KARIN LESLEY OLLEY Trustee 15 March 2019
None on record
POLLY BODMER Trustee 16 March 2017
None on record
GILLIAN MARGARETTE THURLBY Trustee 20 March 2014
None on record