Trustees CLARE HALL IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE
Charity number: 1137491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
54 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shelly Singh-Gryzbon | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Georg Maierhofer | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jehangir Cama | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Matthew Connelly | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Lalita Ramakrishnan | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dieter Tetzner | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Freya Johnson | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Guarav Chaudhary | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Alexandru Marcoci | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Adriano Gualandi | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Johan Gardebo | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr David Duncan | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Per Andrew Reiff-Musgrove | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Dr Laura Maria Castelli | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Erma Hermens | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Samuel Niblett | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Helene Scott-Fordsmand | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Florin Bilbiie | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Madeline Lancaster | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Jun Sung Park | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Rachel Jean Sippy | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Holly Hedgeland | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Stuart Bruce Dalziel | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr William McMahon | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Jingyi Zhao | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Kelly Elizabeth Fagan Robinson | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Anthony William Harris | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||||||
PROFESSOR IAN EDMOND FARNAN | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Sheelagh Pennant | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Pietro Lio | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Professor George van Kooten | Trustee | 23 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Andrew Blake | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Christopher Lee Jenkins | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Emma-Louise Lord | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||||
Professor Manohar Bance | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Li Su | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Hugh Stephen Markus | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Emilio Artacho | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Sir Menelas Pangalos | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Khaled Soufani | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Lucia Tantardini | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Karen Ersche | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|||||||
Dr Annamaria Motrescu-Mayes | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Richard Gerard McMahon | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR HASOK CHANG | Trustee | 01 October 2011 |
|
|||||||
Dr Wai Yi Feng | Trustee | 01 October 2010 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Elizabeth Ashman Rowe | Trustee | 01 October 2009 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Sohini Kar-Narayan | Trustee | 01 October 2009 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Lori Anne Passmore | Trustee | 01 October 2005 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Anthony David Street | Trustee | 01 October 2002 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Robert Paul Carlyon | Trustee | 01 October 1996 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Maria Grazia Spillantini | Trustee | 01 October 1994 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR CHARLES GORDON SMITH | Trustee | 01 October 1993 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR CHARLES ALAN SHORT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.