AL HUDA WELFARE FOUNDATION LTD

Charity number: 1137776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 30 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 30 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 July 2020 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 July 2020 60 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 22 July 2019 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 22 July 2019 52 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 30 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 26 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 26 April 2017 On time Download