THE TABERNACLE GLOBAL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1132617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £826.71k £1.05m £1.35m £997.36k £1.51m
Total expenditure £577.51k £698.67k £801.53k £771.39k £1.05m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £55.26k £35.91k £9.32k £403.64k
Income - Donations and legacies £805.92k £1.01m £1.30m £951.87k £1.49m
Income - Other trading activities £18.15k £30.33k £27.07k £26.84k £10.59k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £5.83k £976 £18.25k £5.52k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £430 £759 £125 £399 £107
Income - Other £2.20k £0 £23.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £564.82k £686.20k £781.07k £750.00k £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.69k £12.48k £20.46k £21.39k £12.11k
Expenditure - Governance £3.95k £4.59k £5.49k £5.09k £5.74k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.95k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0