Governance THE MASTER CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1139904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 19 January 2011: Standard registration
- 25 February 2013: Funds received from 1085738 THE EMILY HUGHES-HALLETT FUND
- 11 May 2016: Funds received from 1137902 THE CLEEVELY FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
- 22 February 2017: Funds received from 1072913 GORDILLO COLERIDGE CHARITABLE TRUST
- 12 November 2018: Funds received from 1081825 THE MARINA KLEINWORT TRUST
- 21 March 2019: Funds received from 803495 THE GLEBE CHARITABLE TRUST
- 18 November 2019: Funds received from 1070291 RIDGEWAY EVANGELICAL CHURCH TRUST
- 07 December 2021: Funds received from 328559 THE JOHN WILFRED TRUST
- 06 April 2022: Funds received from 1118931 MAYHEW CHARITABLE TRUST
- 17 April 2023: Funds received from 1123839 THE VAN TULLEKEN FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.