WARWICK STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1136894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 13 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 12 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 01 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 01 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 18 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 16 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 16 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 30 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 28 February 2017 On time Download