Trustees NOTTING HILL METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1127356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael John Adrian Long | Chair | 01 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Gladwyn Samuels | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Pauline Mullings | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Esther Samuels | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Linda Barnes | Trustee | 13 February 2014 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN ROGER DUCKWORTH MA, FCA | Trustee |
|
||||||
WENDY YARDE CHASE BSC HONS | Trustee |
|
||||||
ELAINE MAGDALENE SPENCE MI EX DIP | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.