Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STOKE D'ABERNON
Charity number: 1128323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Phaedra Pamphilon Green | Chair | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susie Carpenter | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Lee | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Trickey | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janice Christine Scott | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julian Peter Ball | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Vera Saxton | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary-Beth Ladine Louise Hawrish | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Prentice | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Read | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Cyril Blues | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ROSS MEURISSE LRPS | Trustee | 30 March 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.