Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SELBY ST MARY
Charity number: 1130739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev John Charles Weetman | Chair | 13 April 2011 |
|
|||||||||
Gail Morley | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rebecca Joy Watkins | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Peter Bastock | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Christopher James Wilson | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Terence John Cordery | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Dan Thomas | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Julie Sandra Watson | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Paul Simpson | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Fraser William Stewart | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Edward John Watkins | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Christopher John Bywell | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Elaine Ann Exley | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|||||||||
NEIL BAXTER WOODHALL | Trustee | 16 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
NORMAN STEWART SKILBECK | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Karen Michelle Banks | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
SUSAN TAGERT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.