Trustees SCARBOROUGH ATHLETIC CLUB
Charity number: 1131989
Charity reporting is overdue by 57 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Field | Chair | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bailey Denise | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Casey | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katy Rawnsley | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Pattison | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Metcalfe | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dale Hepples | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Thompson | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
HARRY FORKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TONY TOMASZEWICZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRIS WADE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RALPH BROADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.