Trustees DARLINGTON CHRYSANTHEMUM AND DAHLIA SOCIETY
Charity number: 500415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFF GARDENER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gordon Hodgson | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jimmy Howard | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Cherrie | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolle Daniels | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Tate | Trustee | 02 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN THOMPSON | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
IAN DAVID KITCHING | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
RONNY NELSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN BARRIE WISE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KELVIN JOHN VINCENT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARTHUR DAVID MOSS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.