Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS OF MYRA, BRIGHTON
Charity number: 1131831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOMINIC KEECH | Chair | 19 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Paul Misso | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Mary Lindsay Hills | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Chan | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas George Elliott | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Stephen Goldsmith | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aiko Sarah Abigail Somers-Harris | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Obeng | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Linda McKay | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Helen Stimpson | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Louise Wyborn BEd BA | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Clemantine Leyland | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Jane Thomason | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Margaret Baker | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Nigel Clive Nash MBE | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN THOMAS AUTON-LLOYD | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.