Trustees TORRIDGE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1132638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
57 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Robert James Blackhall | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Booth | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julian Allin | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lynne Burgon | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Cooke | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Henry Cooke | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thelma Ann Clarke | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Irene Ross | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Thurston | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anita Southey | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANDREW THOMAS VIDAMOUR | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Vivienne Phyllis Sheriff | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN TREVOR ALLIN | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ANNE RICHARDS | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marie Trevene Noyce | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Dawe | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANN MCKENZIE | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA ANN BABB | Trustee | 08 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Wain | Trustee | 08 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Linda Westall | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Oke | Trustee | 08 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ann Ash | Trustee | 08 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LYNIA BADHAM | Trustee | 07 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Bryan Ley | Trustee | 28 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
GARETH RICHARD PIPER | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN JOYCE BROWN | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|||||
GRAEME LESTER QUANCE | Trustee | 14 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROY ARTHUR STANLEY JOHNS | Trustee | 14 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Judith Marie Quance | Trustee | 11 June 2012 |
|
|||||
MARGARET LILIAN HILL | Trustee | 11 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MARY DANIEL | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
FRANK LEWIS WATSON | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
RUTH ANN BLAKE | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PAIGE GILBERT | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
IRIS MAY CHAPPLE | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN ELIZABETH GILBERT | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER REGINALD JOHN ELLIS | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|||||
LAURA MARY GOAMAN | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Rose Watson | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN LETITIA ELLIS | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
HILDA MARY HARRIS | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE ROSE PEARD | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
STUART JOHN FAULKNER | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANN GOODING | Trustee | 06 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
ELSIE IRENE POTTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LORNA HICKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OLIVE MARY HEYWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA HEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL DAVID STEVENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NANCY HALL-TOMKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VICTOR JOHN HANCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN GEORGE BADDELEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID COURTNEY WATSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
PHILIP JOHN SQUIRE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSANNA MARGARET STEVENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN REGINALD CHAPPLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET CISSIE REED | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.