STONY STRATFORD COMMUNITY CHURCH, (MEMBER OF THE BAPTIST UNION)

Charity number: 1131785
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 November 2020 On time
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 12 October 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)