GRAVESHAM MUSLIMS CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1136194
Charity reporting is up to date (123 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £38.55k £46.87k £46.23k £45.03k £39.26k
Total expenditure £18.68k £28.89k £24.27k £42.72k £30.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A