THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, RANMOOR, SHEFFIELD

Charity number: 1135432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 November 2020 13 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 July 2017 On time Download