Trustees LINCOLNSHIRE POLICE CHARITABLE FUND
Charity number: 500682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francesca Harrod | Chair | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Robson | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Davies | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Pengelly | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Robinson | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Debenham | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Penney | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Stamp | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Bowley-Webb | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Anderson | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Tanya Marie Lord | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Charles Wintin | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard David Bolland | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAUL TIMMINS | Trustee | 23 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Atkinson | Trustee | 22 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Parker | Trustee | 22 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN RICHARDSON | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MCEACHRAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.