DE MONTFORT UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION LIMITED

Charity number: 1138587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £2.31m £1.99m £2.09m £2.28m £2.32m
Total expenditure £2.29m £2.26m £2.01m £2.20m £2.24m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.34m £1.19m £1.20m £1.26m £1.54m
Income - Other trading activities £86.28k £122.43k £112.78k £109.39k £76.17k
Income - Charitable activities £798.95k £560.61k £720.45k £807.55k £632.92k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.26k £1.04k £366 £1.16k £1.25k
Income - Other £81.37k £110.75k £57.20k £101.43k £74.07k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.19m £2.11m £1.88m £2.08m £2.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £98.98k £149.71k £126.48k £112.87k £100.49k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £23.54k £0 £82.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0