DE MONTFORT UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION LIMITED

Charity number: 1138587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Gilks Trustee 28 September 2021 None on record
Aashni Sawjani Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Laura Arends Trustee 29 September 2021
LOST DOG DANCE LTD Recently registered
Luke David Martin Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Sam Sayer Trustee 05 March 2019 None on record
Puja Subramanian Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Benjamin John Smith Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
Youssef Labib Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Danielle Amanda Gillett Trustee 04 March 2014 None on record
Mehul Parkeh Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Joanna Dine-Hart Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record