WAKEFIELD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1134998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 February 2019 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 February 2019 7 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 24 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 August 2017 186 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 05 August 2017 186 days late Download