MID CHESHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1135031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £412.97k £243.44k £935.06k £227.99k £346.23k
Total expenditure £294.31k £446.16k £313.34k £237.11k £279.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £696.24k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £228.23k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £1.72k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £8.87k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £313.34k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £630 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £180 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A