THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST PETER, BURY ST EDMUNDS

Charity number: 1134666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 April 2017 On time Download