GRASSROOT SOCCER (UK)

Charity number: 1135364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.31m £716.48k £554.01k £374.62k £1.22m
Total expenditure £944.60k £816.25k £737.49k £519.13k £731.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.15m £510.10k £362.66k N/A £852.51k
Income - Other trading activities £158.24k £206.11k £191.29k N/A £363.60k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £108 £272 £47 N/A £300
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £740.53k £665.64k £556.94k N/A £497.60k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £150.60k £180.55k N/A £233.31k
Expenditure - Governance £11.35k £8.98k £8.98k N/A £17.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £373.24k N/A £285.40k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £12 £0 N/A £233