Accounts and annual returns CROWSHUTE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1138930
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 30 May 2024 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 06 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 13 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 23 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 15 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required