THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MARY BREDIN, CANTERBURY

Charity number: 1137431
Charity reporting is up to date (131 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £385.05k £443.01k £608.62k £527.22k £465.02k
Total expenditure £390.62k £431.04k £472.96k £521.98k £494.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £541.89k £456.59k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £34.32k £30.47k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £38.70k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £32.42k £1.46k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £5.00k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £454.22k £503.80k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £18.75k £18.17k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £2.01k £1.84k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £3.20k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A