THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MARY BREDIN, CANTERBURY

Charity number: 1137431
Charity reporting is up to date (131 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR ZAC BAWTREE Trustee 21 April 2016 None on record
Sarah Genders Trustee 19 October 2020 None on record
ROSEMARY WADE Trustee 03 August 2012 None on record
TOM GILBERT Trustee 28 April 2017 None on record
Simon Webster Trustee
THE KENWARD TRUST Received: On time
Bryony Williamson Trustee 19 October 2020 None on record
Rev Charmaine Muir Trustee 19 October 2020 None on record
Chloe Baxter Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
Lucy Scarse Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record
Rev STEPHEN CARTER Trustee 18 July 2016 None on record
Rev BARNEY DE BERRY Chair 19 September 2011
CANTERBURY RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
Philip Lewis Trustee 21 October 2013 None on record
HARRY JAMES MACDONALD Trustee None on record
Nedine Watson-Cutts Trustee 19 October 2020 None on record
Samuel Locke Trustee 24 April 2014 None on record
MARTIN STEPHEN COLLINGS Trustee 19 September 2011 None on record
Peter Bobb Trustee 19 October 2020 None on record
Katie Mickleburgh Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record
Angela Swindley Trustee 19 October 2020 None on record
Jacob Nicholson Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
Dr ANDY KING Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
Dr MARGARET GRIFFIN DCL Trustee 21 April 2016 None on record