CHRIST CHURCH WITH ST PHILIP (WORCESTER PARK)

Charity number: 1137612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 18 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 08 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 09 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 17 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 17 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 06 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 06 March 2017 On time Download