CHRIST CHURCH WITH ST PHILIP (WORCESTER PARK)

Charity number: 1137612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kate Oliveira Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
STEPHEN CARPENTER Trustee 08 May 2013 None on record
Virginia Faye Le Mestre Trustee 16 May 2021 None on record
Gaynor Stocker Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
Gloria Yaskey Trustee 16 May 2021 None on record
Jane Caroline Cook Trustee 16 May 2021 None on record
ALISON ELIZABETH CHARLTON Trustee 13 May 2012 None on record
Heather Gill Cordery Trustee 16 May 2021 None on record
Lynn Wicks Trustee 16 May 2021 None on record
Tony Bicknell Trustee 01 May 2014 None on record
REVEREND PAUL DOUGLAS TIMMIS Trustee
WIMBLEDON CIRCUIT (THE METHODIST CHURCH) Received: On time
Susan Dassie Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Vicky Price Trustee 24 April 2016
LINDEN WIND ORCHESTRA Received: On time
Jennifer Pichierri Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Pamela Iris Slater Trustee 16 May 2021 None on record
ROY CLIFFORD NEWITT Trustee
THE LANTERN METHODIST CHURCH OF WIMBLEDON AND RAYNES PARK Received: On time