Accounts and annual returns CLARIFY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1137976
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 December 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 March 2023 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 March 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 February 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required