NETWORK FOR ANIMALS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1142700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £13.52k £286.50k £176.37k £50.59k £242.53k
Total expenditure £2.69k £67.93k £128.10k £226.61k £70.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A