THE RAINFOREST FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity number: 1138287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.32m £3.21m £4.12m £3.13m £1.94m
Total expenditure £2.98m £3.58m £3.88m £3.54m £1.84m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.69m £2.75m £2.76m £2.16m £973.14k
Income - Donations and legacies £183.90k £165.20k £179.10k £328.05k £302.76k
Income - Other trading activities £13.42k £16.46k £32.87k £21.30k £18.37k
Income - Charitable activities £3.12m £3.02m £3.91m £2.78m £1.62m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.11k £1.64k £2.66k £2.20k £287
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £31.69k £843 £69.41k £98.69k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.86m £3.49m £3.78m £3.50m £1.81m
Expenditure - Raising funds £125.63k £82.34k £94.32k £48.47k £32.20k
Expenditure - Governance £25.41k £29.19k £51.72k £69.80k £25.42k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0