DEBRE MEDHANIT KIDANE MEHRET ERITREAN CHRISTIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHDO CHURCH IN UK LTD

Charity number: 1140966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 10 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 September 2019 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 20 September 2019 82 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 24 July 2018 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 July 2018 24 days late Download