BARNSLEY INDEPENDENT ALZHEIMER'S AND DEMENTIA SUPPORT

Charity number: 1140201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 25 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 25 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 20 August 2020 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 20 August 2020 21 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 24 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 12 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 26 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 24 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 17 February 2017 On time Download