UNIVERSITY OF BRISTOL STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1139656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £4.17m £4.37m £4.65m £5.13m £5.12m
Total expenditure £4.20m £4.35m £4.39m £5.04m £4.87m
Income from government contracts £0 £700 £1.30k £200 £1.05k
Income from government grants £500 £0 N/A N/A £78.57k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.02m £2.02m £2.31m £2.37m £2.64m
Income - Other trading activities £511.16k £603.80k £60.00k £93.72k £81.24k
Income - Charitable activities £1.64m £1.74m £2.28m £2.65m £2.34m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £882 £4.17k £3.88k £6.44k £7.95k
Income - Other £0 £0 £8.49k £6.93k £53.68k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.02m £3.15m £4.34m £4.98m £4.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.17m £1.20m £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £28.70k £32.99k £39.55k £32.14k £22.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £50.47k £65.43k £62.54k