WHISPER

Charity number: 1139078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 28 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 21 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 21 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 10 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 10 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 20 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 20 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 09 May 2017 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 09 May 2017 9 days late Download